judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8220
A-8220
01/30/1961
Application for Writ of Error
FIDELITY UNION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
TEXAS WEAVER METHVEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/26/1961Letter brief Respondent
05/23/1961Letter brief Petitioner
05/15/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/14/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/15/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/06/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/30/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/1961Opinion issued
05/26/1961Letter brief
05/23/1961Letter brief
05/15/1961Brief on the Merits
04/14/1961Brief on the Merits
03/22/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Reply to Response
02/06/1961Response to Petition
01/30/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/30/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fidelity Union Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Texas Weaver MethvenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information