judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8224
A-8224
02/01/1961
Application for Writ of Error
SKELLY OIL COMPANY
MATTHEW HARRIS, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/18/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/19/1961Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/01/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/24/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/08/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/01/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/26/1962Response to Motion filed
01/18/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/03/1962Opinion issued
05/19/1961Response to Brief filed
05/01/1961Supplemental Brief filed
04/24/1961Supplemental Brief filed
03/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/08/1961Response to Petition
02/01/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/01/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Skelly Oil CompanyPetitioner
Matthew Harris, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information