judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8222
A-8222
02/01/1961
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
LARRY W. MORRIS
STANDARD OIL COMPANY, CHARLES W. SCALING, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/22/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/15/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/01/1961Certified Question filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1961Opinion issued
02/22/1961Supplemental Brief filed
02/15/1961Brief on the Merits
02/01/1961Certified Question filed
02/01/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles W. Scaling, et al.Respondent
Larry W. MorrisPetitioner
Standard Oil CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information