judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5340
B-5340
06/02/1975
Application for Writ of Error
ALTON KOENNING
MANCO CORPORATION, ET AL., SOUTH-TEX CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/06/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/19/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/19/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/17/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/13/1975Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/11/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/17/1977Letter Filed
01/20/1976Reply to Response
01/12/1976Response to Motion filed
01/06/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/23/1975Opinion issued
11/24/1975Response to Motion filed
11/19/1975Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/19/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/17/1975Reply to Response
06/13/1975Response to Petition
06/11/1975Response to Petition
06/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/02/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alton KoenningPetitioner
South-Tex CorporationRespondent
Cantey, Hanger, Gouch, Cravens and MunnAmicus Curiae
Manco Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information