judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8216
A-8216
01/30/1961
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
FAYE MCEWEN
HON. A. M. HARRISON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/01/1961Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
02/14/1961Reply to ResponseRelator
02/10/1961Motion for RehearingRelator
02/06/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/30/1961Brief on the MeritsRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/01/1963Letter Filed
04/19/1961Opinion issued
03/29/1961Supplemental Brief filed
03/01/1961Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedOverruled
02/14/1961Reply to Response
02/10/1961Motion for RehearingFiling granted
02/06/1961Response to Motion filed
02/06/1961Brief on the Merits
01/30/1961Brief on the Merits
01/30/1961Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. A. M. Harrison, et al.Respondent
FAye McEwenRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information