Register of Actions
Case No. 69DU-CV-09-567
John O Murrin, DeVonna K Murrin, Christopher A LaNave vs Colleen Turgeon Mathew S Mosher, MSM Enterprises LLC, Peder K Davisson, Davisson & Associates PA, Peder K Davisson Revocable Trust et.al | § § § § § |
|
Related Cases |
---|
27-CV-07-2974 (Administrative) |
Lead Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Davisson & Associates PA | |||
Defendant | Davisson, Peder K | |||
Defendant | Mosher, Mathew S | |||
Defendant | MSM Enterprises | |||
Defendant | Peder K Davisson Revocable Trust | |||
Defendant | Turgeon, Colleen | PATRICK J NEATON Retained 952-258-8444(W) | ||
Minneapolis, MN 55410-1868 | ||||
Plaintiff | LaNave, Christopher A | |||
Madison, MN 56256 | ||||
Plaintiff | Murrin, DeVonna K | |||
Seal Beach, CA 90740 | ||||
Plaintiff | Murrin, John O | |||
Seal Beach, CA 90740 |
DISPOSITIONS | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
12/23/2008 | Judgment | |||
12/23/2008 | Judgment | |||
12/23/2008 | Judgment | |||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | ||||
02/20/2009 | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |||
02/20/2009 | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment | |||
02/20/2009 | Transcript of Judgment | |||
02/20/2009 | Transcript of Judgment | |||
02/20/2009 | Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor | |||
02/20/2009 | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |||
02/20/2009 | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment | |||
02/20/2009 | Case Closed | |||
04/19/2010 | Other Document | |||
04/21/2010 | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |||
04/21/2010 | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment |
Defendant Turgeon, Colleen | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 60.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 60.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 05/26/2014 | 0.00 | |||||
02/20/2009 | Transaction Assessment | 60.00 | ||||
02/20/2009 | Mail Payment | Receipt # 69D-2009-04289 | NEATON, PATRICK J | (60.00) | ||
Case Number | Style | Filed/Location/Judicial Officer | Type/Status |
---|---|---|---|
69DU-CV-09-567 | John O Murrin, DeVonna K Murrin, Christopher A LaNave vs Colleen Turgeon Mathew S Mosher, MSM Enterprises LLC, Peder K Davisson, Davisson & Associates PA, Peder K Davisson Revocable Trust et.al | 02/20/2009 - St. Louis-Duluth | Transcript Judgment From Other Minnesota County Closed |