judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8055
A-8055
09/29/1960
Application for Writ of Error
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY, ET AL.
R. T. BURKETT, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/08/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
09/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1960Document received (See Remarks)
11/14/1960Response to Motion filed
11/08/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1960Response to Petition
09/29/1960Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Phillips Petroleum Company, et al.Petitioner
R. T. Burkett, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information