judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY KELLY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1324
Short Caption:GREGORY KELLY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1704-98Filed Date:10/26/2010

Opening Event Date:10/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory Kelly YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Jay Apperson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/17/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
12/07/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's). (Served by: DCCA on 12/7/10).
12/13/2010 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION OF THE 11/17/10 order ...and it appearing that the NOA was deposited in the institution's internal mail system on 10/15/10 and it further appearing that NO TRANSCRIPT IS NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL, it is ORDERED that this court's NOVEMBER 17, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. See DC App. R. 4(d)(I). It is *****MORE*****
12/13/2010 ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (BY: ETW) LW
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
02/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days.
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
02/24/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (maxb still pend).
03/04/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time (maxb & maifp pend).
03/10/2011ORDER DENY APLT MOS to proceed in forma pauperis as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the limited appendix is filed with this court. (By: ETW)
03/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/25/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (Titled, Motion to Comply with Court's Order).
03/25/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief.
04/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011APPENDIX - limited
05/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 17, 2011
06/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 17, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/17/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/17/2011APPENDIX - aple's
06/17/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/21/2011FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Denied
01/19/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for appointment of counsel
06/14/2012FiledLetter From appellant with concerns regarding the status of his case (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Beckwith,Oberly,Terry
10/17/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
11/08/2012FiledMandate
11/13/2012LodgedLetter From Appellant a Notice of Appeal for the instant case (Appellant)
12/04/2012FiledLetter To Appellant returning the 11/13/12 filing sent to the US District Court