Case Information: 33466 | |||
Short Caption: | SHALANT VS. VARSOLONA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A368515 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/11/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David B. Huebner--check no. 1885. | ||
12/14/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 98-00366 | |
01/12/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 99-00160 | |
02/11/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volume 1 and 2. Mailed on: 2/8/99. | 99-00946 | |
02/11/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/12/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Shalant sought leave to file a brief and requested oral argument. The record in the district court contains ample documentation of the parties' positions and arguments in this matter and that additional briefing and argument is therefore unnecessary]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-06175 | |
08/09/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2. | 99-07296 | |
08/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/18/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 1999. | 99-07296 |