judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8040
A-8040
09/06/1960
Application for Writ of Error
DELHI- TAYLOR OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.
CHRISTIAN R. HOLMES, ET AL., CHRISTINE R. HOLMES, ET AL. AND A. W. GREGG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/09/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/24/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/11/1961Post submission brief filedRespondent
01/03/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
12/23/1960Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
09/20/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
09/06/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/09/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/22/1961Opinion issued
01/24/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/11/1961Post submission brief filed
01/03/1961Response to Petition
12/23/1960Brief on the Merits
11/16/1960Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1960Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1960Document received (See Remarks)
09/20/1960Response to Petition
09/06/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/06/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John W. StaytonAmicus Curiae
Christine R. Holmes, et al. and A. W. GreggRespondent
Christian R. Holmes, et al.Respondent
Delhi- Taylor Oil Corporation, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information