judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33465
Short Caption:HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39058 , 39690 , 67583 , 67583-COA , 67750 , 69839 , 69839-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C074681Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/12/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00358
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00321
05/12/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. Mailed on 5/10/99. 99-03843
05/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10162
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11261
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 1999. 99-11261