judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation v. W. N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0163)
Case Number:S-08-0163Case Docketed On:08/01/2008
Linked To: S-08-0164 , S-08-0165
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation v. W. N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. W. N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantOhio Casualty Insurance CompanyPatrick J. Murphy
Scott P. Klosterman
AppelleeW.N. McMurry Construction Co.Weston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Insurance Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 57
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/01/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/31/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Ohio Casualty.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W.W. Reeves for W.N. McMurry Construction Co.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/26/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, original papers from 06-271; Volume VI, Supreme Court record 06-271; Volume VII, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/17/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Murphy, Scott Klosterman for appellant, argument by Mr. Murphy; Weston W. Reeves, Anna Reeves Olson for cross appellant, argument by Mr. Reeves; Richard Mincer for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/04/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing S-08-0163, dismissing S-08-0164 and affirming S-08-0165. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/20/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/20/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/24/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards (Record signed for 5/21/10)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal