judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER BYNUM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1323
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER BYNUM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-23796-09Filed Date:10/26/2010

Opening Event Date:10/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/26/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Bynum Y
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Amanda J. Winchester NN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/09/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Warren Gorman, Esquire
11/16/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (16 pgs/tape) 4/26/10 proc. w/cd
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
01/05/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/05/2011APPENDIX
02/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/7/11
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/08/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief/appendix
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for Summary Affirmance.
05/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...The denial of a motion for reduction in sentence is reviewed for an abuse of discretion...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
05/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal is AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
05/26/2011MANDATE ISSUED