judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARDWARE DEALERS MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ET AL.

Case: B-1437
B-1437
03/18/1969
Application for Writ of Error
HARDWARE DEALERS MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/14/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/19/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/22/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/14/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/02/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1969Letter Filed
08/14/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/13/1969Motion for leave to file brief
07/30/1969Opinion issued
05/19/1969Reply to Response
05/09/1969Motion for leave to file brief
04/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/14/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/02/1969Response to Petition
03/18/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/18/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Automobile Dealers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Sheehy, Jones, Cureton, Westbrook and LovelaceAmicus Curiae
Universal Underwriters Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Hardware Dealers Mutual Fire Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Farmers Insurance Exchange, et al.Respondent
Strasburger, Price, Kelton, Martin and UnisAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information