judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8042
A-8042
09/06/1960
Application for Writ of Error
U.S. TRUCK LINES, INC.
TEXACO, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/25/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/29/1960Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
11/01/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/26/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
09/06/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/28/1961Response to Motion filed
01/25/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/29/1960Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
11/01/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/26/1960Response to Petition
09/09/1960Document received (See Remarks)
09/06/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. L. JamesAmicus Curiae
Texaco, Inc.Respondent
U.S. Truck Lines, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information