judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8043
A-8043
09/12/1960
Application for Writ of Error
F. M. CHANCEY
NEW AMSTERDAM CASUALTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/10/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/21/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
09/12/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1961Letter Filed
11/14/1960Response to Motion filed
11/10/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/21/1960Response to Petition
09/12/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/12/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
New Amsterdam Casualty CompanyRespondent
F. M. ChanceyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information