judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8154
A-8154
12/27/1960
Application for Writ of Error
PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION, LELAND FIKES, W. B. NEELY, ET AL.
H. L. CAIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/12/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
02/28/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/21/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/31/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/31/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/29/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/11/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
12/27/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
02/28/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/22/1962Motion for leave to file brief
02/21/1962Brief in Support of Petition
02/14/1962Motion for leave to file brief
02/05/1962Response to Motion filed
01/31/1962Brief in Support of Petition
01/31/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1962Dissenting opinion issued.
01/17/1962Opinion issued
07/29/1961Supplemental Brief filed
02/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
01/11/1961Response to Petition
12/27/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/27/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. L. CainRespondent
F. H. Pannill, Tom Sealy and Robert M. TurpinAmicus Curiae
Pan American Petroleum Corporation, Leland Fikes, W. B. Neely, et al.Petitioner
Gordon SimpsonAmicus Curiae
Irby L. Dyer, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information