judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8158
A-8158
12/28/1960
Application for Writ of Error
BIBLE BAPTIST SEMINARY AND WORLD BAPTIST FELLOWSHIP
FIRST BAPTIST CHURCH OF FORT WORTH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/29/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/18/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/17/1961Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/03/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/29/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/11/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/11/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
12/28/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/28/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1961Reply to Response
05/24/1961Response to Motion filed
05/18/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1961Opinion issued
04/17/1961Response to Brief filed
04/13/1961Response to Motion filed
04/03/1961Brief on the Merits
03/29/1961Brief on the Merits
03/01/1961Document received (See Remarks)
01/11/1961Response to Petition
01/11/1961Response to Petition
12/28/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/28/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/28/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bible Baptist Seminary and World Baptist FellowshipPetitioner
First Baptist Church of Fort WorthRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information