judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8138
A-8138
12/08/1960
Application for Writ of Error
H. M. HARRELL, ET AL.
ATLANTIC REFINING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/13/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/16/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/06/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/17/1961Response to Motion filed
04/13/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1961Reply to Response
01/06/1961Response to Petition
12/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/08/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Atlantic Refining CompanyRespondent
H. M. Harrell, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information