judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8153
A-8153
12/22/1960
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
HUBBARD L. HARDIN
ANN C. HARDIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/01/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/01/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/01/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/22/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1960Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/22/1960Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/22/1961Opinion issued
02/14/1961Response to Petition
02/01/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/01/1961Supplemental Brief filed
02/01/1961Brief in Support of Petition
02/01/1961Letter Filed
01/31/1961Bond
12/22/1960Order from Lower Court filed
12/22/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/22/1960Brief in Support of Petition
12/22/1960Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ann C. HardinRespondent
Hubbard L. HardinPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information