judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND G. PETERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1320
Short Caption:RAYMOND G. PETERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD6939-10Filed Date:10/22/2010

Opening Event Date:10/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond G. PetersNPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kevin A. Chambers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/09/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert Hollander, Esquire
12/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/01/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (attached to SRT)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4pgs/Tape) 4/22/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 6/2/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (111pgs/Tape) 8/16/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (33pgs/Tape) 9/21/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (21pgs/Tape) 9/22/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/22/2011FiledSubmitted To Ruiz,Oberly,King
11/23/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.)
12/08/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledMandate