judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILSON VS. RADCLIFFE

Case Information: 33462
Short Caption:WILSON VS. RADCLIFFECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A383217Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mary E. Wilson--check no. 2001.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00359
01/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00159
01/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to appellant Mary E. Wilson. We are forwarding her "Amended Notice of Appeal" to the Clark County Clerk for processing.
02/10/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-00944
02/10/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order of dismissal and remand this case for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn4[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00515
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2. 00-01974
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2000. 00-01974