judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8172
A-8172
01/09/1961
Application for Writ of Error
PAN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
HI-PLAINS HAULERS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/18/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
10/18/1961Opinion issued
06/26/1961Miscellaneous letter
05/10/1961Document received (See Remarks)
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/09/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pan American Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Hi-Plains Haulers, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information