judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8180
A-8180
01/09/1961
Application for Writ of Error
PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ET AL., SABINE ROYALTY CORPORATION, ET AL., JERRY (GERRY) WAYNE REESE, ET AL., MRS. ADAIR REMBERT, ET AL.
TEXAS PACIFIC COAL AND OIL COMPANY, ET AL., R. H. VENABLE, ET AL., VENABLE AND ROYALL, JAMES O. FOX, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1961Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/15/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/13/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/27/1961Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
02/16/1961Reply to ResponseRespondent
01/23/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/20/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/16/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1961Response to Motion filed
03/16/1961Brief in Support of Petition
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/15/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/13/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1961Supplement to Petition filed
02/16/1961Reply to Response
01/23/1961Response to Petition
01/23/1961Response to Petition
01/20/1961Response to Petition
01/16/1961Response to Petition
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/09/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerry (Gerry) Wayne Reese, et al.Petitioner
Mrs. Adair Rembert, et al.Petitioner
Texas Pacific Coal and Oil Company, et al.Respondent
R. H. Venable, et al.Respondent
James O. Fox, Jr., et al.Respondent
Pan American Petroleum Corporation, et al.Petitioner
Venable and RoyallRespondent
Sabine Royalty Corporation, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information