judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00760-CR
01-89-00760-CR
07/25/1989
Other Felony
Murray, Mrs. Harold
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/20/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/02/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
02/15/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/31/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/31/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/08/1991Submitted
01/08/1991Submission
01/08/1991Submitted
12/12/1990Submission
07/25/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
07/25/1989Transcript filed
07/25/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasRussell Richardson
StateCriminal - AppellantRoy G Romo
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 12
Harris
4553
$400.00 fine