judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00241-CV
08-89-00241-CV
07/25/1989
Contract
Bass, Jr., Mrs. Ray A.
Southwestern Bell Media Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/11/1990Fee paid
01/05/1990Shuck purged
01/05/1990Mandate Issued
01/05/1990Mandate Issued
09/13/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/13/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/13/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/13/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
08/16/1989Motion postponed, to be heard later
08/15/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/03/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/28/1989Fee paid
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/03/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. J. Lawton Henry
UnknownAppelleeHon. D. Brent Wells
UnknownAppellantHon. Ray Bass III
UnknownAppelleeHon. H. Keith Lynch
UnknownAppelleeHon. Deborah Heaton McElvaney
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
86-49310