judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00270-CV
08-89-00270-CV
07/25/1989
Contract
Cox, Lowell D.
G. M. & B. International Corporation
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/14/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/08/1989Shuck purged
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Submission
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Neal H. Paster
UnknownAppellantHon. Richard D. Heyen
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
85-05342