judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00269-CV
08-89-00269-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Sorley, Michael Garland
Laguarta, Gavrel & Kirk, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/14/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/23/1999Fee paid
10/31/1990Shuck purged
10/31/1990Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Mandate Issued
08/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/26/1990Submitted
06/25/1990Filed waiver of oral argument
06/22/1990Brief Filed
05/02/1990Submission
12/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Brief Filed
11/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
11/29/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
11/28/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/27/1989Brief Filed
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Brief Filed
11/15/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/15/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/15/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/08/1989Brief Filed
11/08/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/27/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/27/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/27/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/12/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/11/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/05/1989A Reply Filed in Answer to a Response Filed
10/04/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/27/1989Miscellaneous filing
09/27/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/27/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Order entered
09/27/1989Order entered
09/27/1989Order entered
09/26/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/26/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/25/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Order entered
09/20/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/13/1989Motion to supplement filed
09/08/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/11/1989Miscellaneous filing
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/14/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. W. Briscoe Swan
UnknownAppelleeHon. Lillian M. Flurry
UnknownAppellee
UnknownInterested party, attorney, personHon. Michael W. Schultz
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris
84-28074A