judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00258-CR
08-89-00258-CR
07/25/1989
Other Felony
Pye, Henry Clay
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/13/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/1990Mandate Issued
12/21/1990Shuck purged
12/21/1990Mandate Issued
11/28/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
11/28/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
08/28/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1990Submitted
06/25/1990Submission
06/25/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/16/1990Brief Filed
04/16/1990Case ready to be set
04/16/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
04/16/1990Case ready to be set
04/04/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/21/1990Brief Filed
02/21/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/17/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/06/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/21/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/18/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Order entered
10/10/1989Transcript Filed
10/03/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. John B. Holmes
UnknownCriminal - AppellantKristine C. Woldy
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
494,236
20 yrs. TDC