judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00257-CV
08-89-00257-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Borg-Warner Acceptance Corporation
Judnell Enterprises, Inc., & George H. Nelson, Jr.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/10/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
03/19/1990Fee paid
03/13/1990Fee paid
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/28/1990Payment of fee due requested
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1990Submitted
02/23/1990Submission
02/23/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
10/08/1989Case ready to be set
10/08/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Filed waiver of oral argument
09/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/01/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/25/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
08/07/1989Fee paid
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/10/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. J. Patrick Coulson
UnknownAppelleeHon. Sylvester Turner
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
87-49300