judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00245-CV
08-89-00245-CV
07/25/1989
Divorce
Cisneros, III, Thomas
Cisneros, Elva Alice
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/06/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/14/1990Shuck purged
06/01/1990Mandate Issued
06/01/1990Mandate Issued
04/16/1990Fee paid
04/09/1990Fee paid
03/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990Payment of fee due requested
03/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/03/1989Submitted
11/03/1989Submission
11/03/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission
09/01/1989Case ready to be set
09/01/1989Case ready to be set
08/07/1989Brief Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/07/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/06/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Bruce A. Baughman
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ron Hayes
UnknownAppelleeHon. John R. Coe
Trial Court Information
312th District Court
Harris
81-34116