judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00755-CV
01-89-00755-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Souther Protective Services, Inc.
Sherri Lynn Funderburk and Gary Vernon Pesina
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/19/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/04/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/04/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
04/04/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Submission
01/25/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/25/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/25/1990Case ready to be set
01/16/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/18/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/13/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/15/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/16/1989Statement of facts filed
09/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/24/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/10/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/10/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
08/10/1989Transcript filed
08/03/1989Filing fee paid
07/25/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/25/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeWoodrow Wilson Miller
StateAppellantHon. Charles J. Maddox
StateAppellantDavid Kirkendall
StateAppellantJoseph M. Van Nest
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
87-10859