judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00268-CV
08-89-00268-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Health Enterprises, Inc.
Patsy J. Tolden
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/14/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/29/1990Shuck purged
10/29/1990Mandate Issued
10/29/1990Mandate Issued
08/29/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/22/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
08/20/1990Fee paid
08/13/1990Fee paid
08/09/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1990Submitted
06/25/1990Submission
06/25/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/19/1990Miscellaneous filing
04/09/1990Brief Filed
11/09/1989Brief Filed
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/17/1989Brief Filed
10/04/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/28/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/21/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/15/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/09/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Order entered
08/02/1989Fee paid
08/02/1989Fee paid
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/14/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Gregory B. Enos
UnknownAppellantHon. Mark D. Rayburn
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Henry G. Dalehited
88CV1149