judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00238-CV
08-89-00238-CV
07/25/1989
Workers Compensation
Director, State Employees Workers' Compensation Division
Estate of Erma J. Spencer
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/28/1990Shuck purged
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission
03/22/1990Submitted
01/31/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/1990Submission
01/24/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
01/24/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/01/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/25/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/03/1989Transcript Filed
06/26/1989Statement of Facts Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Fred Garrett
UnknownAppelleeHon. Steven F. Mafrige
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ronald Kormanik
Trial Court Information
335th District Court
Washington
29,225