judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00260-CV
07-89-00260-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Pagano, Phillip, Midway Investments, Ltd., dba et al
Briercroft Service Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/15/1991Mandate Issued
11/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/05/1990Submitted
11/05/1990Submission
10/10/1990Submission
09/18/1989Brief Filed
09/18/1989Case ready to be set
08/24/1989Brief Filed
07/25/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pagano, Phillip Midway InvestAppellantGregory V. Novak
Briercroft Service CorporationAppelleeMary R. Ortiz
Charles B. Frye
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
88-522,589