judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00248-CR
08-89-00248-CR
07/25/1989
Theft
Choate, Evie Denise aka Denise Westbrook
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/07/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/30/1989Shuck purged
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
09/13/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/13/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/01/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/24/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
08/17/1989Transcript Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
06/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/30/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Frank Blazek
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Jerry D. Patchen
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Walker
14,882
5 yrs. TDC & $95. CC