judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00247-CR
08-89-00247-CR
07/25/1989
Robbery
Lawrence, Jr., Link
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/07/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1990Shuck purged
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
03/09/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Fee paid
01/25/1990Fee paid
01/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/15/1989Submitted
12/15/1989Submission
12/15/1989Submitted
10/31/1989Submission
10/11/1989Brief Filed
10/11/1989Case ready to be set
10/11/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Case ready to be set
09/27/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/28/1989Brief Filed
07/27/1989Exhibits Filed
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Transcript Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/03/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Neely C. Lewis
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
18,421-85
99 yrs. TDC