judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00239-CV
08-89-00239-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Action Machine Shop, Inc. and Sam Marshall
Mori Seiki Company, Ltd.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1990Mandate Issued
11/29/1990Shuck purged
11/29/1990Mandate Issued
11/07/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
11/07/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
08/30/1990Fee paid
08/07/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/27/1990Application for Writ of Error
07/27/1990Fee paid
06/27/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/27/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
06/18/1990Fee paid
06/14/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/11/1990Fee paid
05/30/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/30/1990Opinion issuedOverruled
05/23/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
05/16/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
05/14/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
05/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1990Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
03/22/1990Miscellaneous filing
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission
03/22/1990Submitted
03/19/1990Supplemental Transcript Filed
03/15/1990Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1990Motion to supplement filed
03/15/1990Order entered
01/31/1990Submission
01/12/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/07/1989Fee paid
10/31/1989Payment of fee due requested
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
09/27/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/11/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/07/1989Fee paid
08/30/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/30/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/1989Fee paid
08/17/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/17/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
08/17/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/17/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/11/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
08/10/1989Deposition Filed
08/10/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/10/1989Transcript Filed
08/09/1989Miscellaneous filing
08/09/1989Motion - Extension time to file bond dispMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/09/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/09/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/1989Miscellaneous filing
08/08/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
08/01/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Miscellaneous filing
07/25/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
07/25/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
07/12/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/03/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Lance Olinde, Jr.
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ross Citti
UnknownAppellantHon. Larry D. Thompson
UnknownAppelleeHon. Finis Cowan, III
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
121,251-A