judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00359-CV
04-89-00359-CV
07/25/1989
Summary Judgment
Ruben L. Briones
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/03/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
08/16/1990Information regarding cause received
08/03/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/18/1990Writ of Error filed
06/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/14/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/04/1990Submitted
01/04/1990Submission
01/04/1990Submitted
11/27/1989Submission
10/04/1989Amicus Curiae Brief Received
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
09/15/1989Brief Filed
09/15/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
08/22/1989Brief Filed
08/22/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/17/1989Information regarding cause received
08/16/1989Information regarding cause received
08/02/1989Information regarding cause received
07/25/1989No Description Available.
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/12/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/17/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
224th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
87-CI-13761
n/a