judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00250-CV
08-89-00250-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Central Freight Lines, Inc.
Naztec, Incorporated
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/07/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/2011Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/19/1990Shuck purged
07/19/1990Mandate Issued
07/19/1990Mandate Issued
05/23/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1990Fee paid
05/10/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/04/1990Fee paid
04/25/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
04/25/1990Payment of fee due requested
04/25/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
02/23/1990Submitted
02/23/1990Submission
02/23/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Filed waiver of oral argument
11/22/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/07/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/13/1989Filed waiver of oral argument
09/18/1989Fee paid
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/12/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/12/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/06/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/01/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/16/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1989Order entered
08/07/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
07/31/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/07/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Benjamin N. Hamilton
UnknownAppelleeHon. Pamela Prince Stines
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
513,245