judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00251-CR
08-89-00251-CR
07/25/1989
Burglary
Hill, Gary Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/10/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/1990Shuck purged
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
07/11/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
07/11/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
04/02/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/23/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1990Submitted
02/09/1990Submission
02/09/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
12/20/1989Brief Filed
12/20/1989Case ready to be set
12/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Case ready to be set
12/11/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
12/05/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/29/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Order entered
11/14/1989Motion to supplement filed
11/08/1989Brief Filed
11/08/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/18/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Order entered
10/04/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
08/28/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Linda Cryer
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. John B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
526,926
59 yrs. TDC