judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8893
C-8893
07/26/1989
Granted application that originated as 130(d) mo.
JOYCE K. EVANS INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF AMANDA JO
ILLINOIS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/30/1990Post submission brief filedRespondent
01/24/1990Reply BriefRespondentRESP'S REPLY TO PET'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
01/19/1990Reply BriefPetitionerREPLY TO MO TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
09/22/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/17/1990Mandate issuedNO REHEARING FILED 790 SW2d 302
05/31/1990Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record
05/30/1990Dissenting opinion issued.BY J.MAUZY JOIN BY J.RAY.
05/30/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledRSP MO/TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
05/30/1990Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedBY J.HIGHTOWER 790 SW2d 302 (DISSENTING OP. BY J.MAUZY JOIN/J.RAY)
01/30/1990Post submission brief filed
01/24/1990Reply BriefRESP'S REPLY TO PET'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
01/19/1990Reply BriefREPLY TO MO TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
01/10/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY JOE K. CREWS ARGUED FOR RESP BY JEFF R. BOGGESS AND SUSAN K. LAUGHEAD
01/03/1990Miscellaneous MotionMOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FACTS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF
11/08/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20-10 MINUTES.
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGRANTED ON PTS. 1 & 2.
11/08/1989Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
09/22/1989Reply to Response
09/11/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedREPLY DUE SEPTEMBER 21, 1989.
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
08/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/26/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
07/26/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/17/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BRAWDY, LARRY WAYNEPetitionerMr. Joe K. Crews
MELENDEZ, GAILPetitionerMr. Joe K. Crews
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00687-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 05-24-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN WHITTINGTON
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Grayson
Honorable Ray F. Grisham
108,369