judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00195-CR
02-89-00195-CR
07/25/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Dietrich, Cheryl Marie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/22/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
06/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/05/1990Letter Brief Filed
02/20/1990Submitted
02/20/1990Submission
02/08/1990Order Entered
12/20/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Submission
08/24/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/25/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
07/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dietrich, Cheryl MarieCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Harry Hopkins
0300619D
15 yrs. TDC