judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00194-CR
02-89-00194-CR
07/25/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Harris, David Glen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1990Mandate Issued
11/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
09/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/28/1990Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/24/1990Order Entered
01/22/1990Brief Filed
12/22/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/27/1989Brief Filed
11/27/1989Submission
10/23/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/19/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/22/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
07/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Harris, David GlenCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
0336618R
65 yrs., TDC