judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00196-CR
02-89-00196-CR
07/25/1989
All Misdemeanors
Texas, The State of
Wycoff, William Frank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/1991Mandate Issued
08/07/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/03/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/10/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
03/12/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/03/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1991Response Filed
12/26/1990Motion Filed
12/17/1990Letter Brief Filed
12/17/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1990Motion Filed
12/05/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/14/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/1990Response Filed
04/20/1990Response Filed
04/16/1990Motion Filed
04/06/1990Brief Filed
03/22/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/21/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/19/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Submission
11/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/10/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/08/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989No Description Available.
08/03/1989No Description Available.
08/01/1989Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/31/1989Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
07/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppellant
Wycoff, William FrankAppellee
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
0319294
$300.Fine & $164.Cost,90da