judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00235-CR
08-89-00235-CR
07/25/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Macias, Jr., Rujelio
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/1990Shuck purged
09/20/1990Mandate Issued
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1990Submitted
06/28/1990Submission
06/28/1990Submitted
05/16/1990Brief Filed
05/16/1990Case ready to be set
05/16/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
05/16/1990Case ready to be set
05/02/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1990Order entered
05/02/1990Submission
04/16/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/21/1990Brief Filed
03/21/1990Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/1990Miscellaneous filing
03/07/1990Motion for leave to * filed
02/09/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
01/26/1990Order entered
12/29/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
11/22/1989Exhibits Filed
11/22/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/09/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/07/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
10/25/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
08/30/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1989Order entered
08/14/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/06/1989Transcript Filed
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Jack Stern
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Ralph Gonzales
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Richard A. Dawson
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Sam W. Dick
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
18,216-A
35yrs TDC w/476 day credit