judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00236-CR
08-89-00236-CR
07/25/1989
Other Felony
Wilson, Arnold
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
06/28/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/1990Judgment IssuedDismissed
05/02/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1990Mandate Issued
05/02/1990Judgment IssuedDismissed
05/02/1990Mandate Issued
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
04/25/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/29/1990Submission
03/09/1990Case ready to be set
03/09/1990Case ready to be set
02/05/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
12/06/1989Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/1989Order entered
11/17/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
11/08/1989Order entered
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion postponed, to be heard later
09/11/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
09/11/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/28/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
08/24/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/18/1989Transcript Filed
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantMr. Arnold Wilson
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Mike Little
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
6395
10 yrs