Case Information: 33455 | |||
Short Caption: | SALGUERO (MILDER) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR93P1371 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/10/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/10/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00325 | |
12/11/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice of Redesignation of Appeal. Redesignated as a fast track appeal. | ||
12/14/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 98-00375 | |
12/22/1998 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal to Nevada Supreme Court filed in district court on 12/15/98. Scott W. Edwards appointed as counsel for appellant. | 98-00480 | |
12/31/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 98-00580 | |
12/31/1998 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Respondent's Appendix. | 98-00584 | |
02/10/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-00915 | |
03/09/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-01653 | |
03/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/16/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 1999. | 99-01653 |