judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY v. SOUTHERN BROKERAGE COMPANY

Case: B-1439
B-1439
03/19/1969
Application for Writ of Error
AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
SOUTHERN BROKERAGE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/06/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/03/1969Post submission brief filedPetitioner
04/17/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/12/1969Motion to Correct filed
07/14/1969Response to Motion filed
07/10/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/25/1969Opinion issued
06/06/1969Response to Brief filed
06/03/1969Post submission brief filed
04/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
04/17/1969Reply to Response
04/03/1969Response to Petition
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Aetna Casualty and Surety CompanyPetitioner
Southern Brokerage CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information