judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00243-CV
08-89-00243-CV
07/25/1989
Other Personal Injury
Briscoe, Mona
St.Joseph Hosp.Foundation,&Sisters of Charity dba St.Joseph
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/05/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/08/1989Shuck purged
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Submission
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Case ready to be set
08/18/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
08/09/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/09/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Order entered
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/13/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/13/1989Motion to supplement filed
07/05/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. William V. Wade
UnknownAppellantHon. Frederick P. Forlano
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
87-00624